HI HB1669 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a residential property assessed clean energy (PACE) program. Allows residential property owners to finance qualified renewable energy improvements through a non-ad valorum property assessment and revenue bonds.
Title
Relating To Renewable Energy.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Hashem [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2020-01-29 | House | Re-referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 8 |
2020-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 01-30-20 11:25AM in conference room 325. |
2020-01-28 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 01-30-20 at 11:25AM. |
2020-01-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 01-28-20 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2020-01-21 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2020-01-15 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-14 | House | Prefiled. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1669&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB1669_.HTM |