HI HB1669 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Office of Planning and Sustainable Development to establish a pilot program to develop a Waikiki adaptation and resilience plan to address climate change and sea level impacts in the Waikiki Special District. Requires reports to the Legislature. Makes an appropriation. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Sea Level Rise Adaptation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-18 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3318) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2022-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-18-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 139). |
2022-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, McDermott, Nakashima excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 895-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-03-02 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2022-02-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-02-22 1:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Kong, Okimoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). |
2022-02-15 | House | Reported from WAL/EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 279-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-02-08 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Matayoshi, Perruso, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2022-02-08 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Morikawa, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kong; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2022-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL/EEP on Tuesday, 02-08-22 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to WAL/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2022-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2724 (Same As) 2022-03-10 - Referred to WAL/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 24
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Office of Planning and Sustainable Development
Pilot Program
Report
Sea Level Rise
Waikiki Adaptation and Resilience Plan
Office of Planning and Sustainable Development
Pilot Program
Report
Sea Level Rise
Waikiki Adaptation and Resilience Plan