HI HB1699 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-21 - Referred to WAL, CPC, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-21 - Referred to WAL, CPC, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
For agency failure to act within established time periods on applications for business and development-related permits and licenses, repeals provisions that require automatic application approval or require an application to be deemed complete.
Title
Permit Approval; Business; Housing; Administrative Procedure
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-21 | House | Referred to WAL, CPC, referral sheet 3 |
2014-01-16 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2014-01-15 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2705 (Same As) 2014-02-04 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1699&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB1699_.HTM |