HI SB2705 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-04 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-04 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
For agency failure to act within established time periods on applications for business and development-related permits and licenses, repeals provisions that require automatic application approval or require an application to be deemed complete.
Title
Permit Approval; Business; Housing; Administrative Procedure
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-04 | Senate | The committee on CPN deferred the measure. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-04-14 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2014-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-14 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to CPN, JDL. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1699 (Same As) 2014-01-21 - Referred to WAL, CPC, referral sheet 3
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2705&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/SB2705_.HTM |