HI HB1719 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Suspends state and county contributions to the EUTF for all state and county employee-beneficiaries who retire after 7/1/09, regardless of date of hire and years of service, if the employee retires before the employee's medicare retirement age. Resumes coverage after medicare retirement age. Allows employee to retain health coverage through the EUTF by paying the respective state or county share of premiums until medicare retirement age.
Title
EUTF; Retirement Prior to Medicare Age; Suspend Coverage
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-13 | (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be HELD. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Yamashita, Aquino, Awana, Hanohano, Keith-Agaran, M. Lee, Nakashima, Saiki, Souki, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Pine. | |
2009-02-09 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 02-13-09 8:30AM in House conference room 309. | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 5 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Passed First Reading |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1719&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HB1719_.HTM |