HI HB177 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB177
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the State's preemptory powers over the regulation of tobacco products. Clarifies the county powers to adopt and enforce ordinances and rules.
Title
Relating To Tobacco Products.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB159 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
HB177 (Carry Over) 2019-01-22 - Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
HB177 (Carry Over) 2019-01-22 - Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=177&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB177_.HTM |