HI HB178 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-18 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Pouha excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-18 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Pouha excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the county clerk to electronically transmit absentee ballots if mailed absentee ballots are not received by the voter within five days of an election or if the voter otherwise requires a replacement ballot within the same period. (HD1)
Title
Office of Elections Package; Absentee Voting; Electronic Transmission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Pouha excused (1). |
2015-02-18 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 261) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-02-05 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: McDermott; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-05-15 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-01-30 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-05-15. |
2015-01-28 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 01-30-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2015-01-23 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB441 (Same As) 2015-02-20 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL.