HI HB1793 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-01 - (H) The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-01 - (H) The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes penalties for the destruction or harvesting of native forest resources including the sandalwood tree. Establishes Department of Land and Natural Resources policies and rules to protect native forest resources. Effective January 7, 2059. (HB1793 HD2)
Title
Native Forest Resources; Sandalwood; DLNR
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry Chang [D] | Rep. Ken Ito [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-01 | (H) The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | |
2012-02-27 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2012-02-26 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-29-12 1:30PM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-02-17 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes, Kawakami, M. Lee, Mizuno, Morikawa excused (5). | |
2012-02-17 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 633-12) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2012-02-13 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Herkes, Luke, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Cabanilla, Carroll, Coffman, Ito, McKelvey. | |
2012-02-10 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-13-12 2:05PM in conference room 325. | |
2012-02-10 | (H) The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-12. | |
2012-02-08 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-10-12 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-02-08 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and C. Lee excused (1). | |
2012-02-08 | (H) Reported from WLO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 192-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2012-02-03 | (H) The committees on WLO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Chang, Har, Carroll, Coffman, Herkes, Ito, Kawakami, Nakashima, Riviere, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla. | |
2012-02-01 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-03-12 10:10AM in conference room 325. | |
2012-01-27 | (H) The committee(s) on WLO recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-03-12. | |
2012-01-24 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by WLO on Friday, 01-27-12 9:00AM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-01-19 | (H) Referred to WLO, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2012-01-18 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-13 | (H) Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
SB3028 (Same As) 2012-03-08 - (H) Referred to WLO, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 41