HI HB1798 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-16 - (H) The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-16 - (H) The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires probation officer, prior to early discharge of defendant, to report to court concerning defendants compliance or noncompliance with terms of probation.
Title
Probation; Early Discharge; Compliance Report; Judiciary Package
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-16 | (H) The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | |
2012-02-14 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-16-12 2:15PM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-01-19 | (H) Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2012-01-18 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-13 | (H) Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
SB2056 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - (S) Act 143, 6/20/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1245).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1798 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB1798_.HTM |