HI HB1824 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates an unspecified amount of funds for five full-time equivalent (5.0 FTE) Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program Specialist positions within the Office of the Long-Term Care Ombudsman, assigned to each county as follows: one for the City and County of Honolulu, one for the County of Maui, two for the County of Hawaii, and one for the County of Kauai. (SD1)
Title
Making An Appropriation For The Office Of The Long-term Care Ombudsman Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3372) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Acasio, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Referred to HMS, WAM. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 40). |
2022-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Todd excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 737-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-02-24 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2022-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-24-22 2:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1). |
2022-02-16 | House | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 428-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-02-10 | House | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2022-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Thursday, 02-10-22 9:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2022-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2676 (Same As) 2022-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.