HI SB2676 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes and appropriates funds for five permanent Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program Specialist Positions within the Office of the Long-Term Care Ombudsman, assigned to each county as follow: one for the City and County of Honolulu, one for the county of Maui, two for the county of Hawaii, and one for the county of Kauai. Requires the Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program Specialist to work under the supervision of the Long-Term Care Ombudsman to achieve the goals of the Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program, as mandated by the federal Older Americans Act. (SD1)
Title
Making An Appropriation For The Office Of The Long-term Care Ombudsman Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2569) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Acasio, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-22 3:10PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HMS, WAM. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1824 (Same As) 2022-03-24 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.