HI HB1895 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-02 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-02 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a penalty for landlord violations of the residential landlord-tenant code. Establishes minimum notice requirements for landlords terminating rental agreements. Limits the allowable amount for landlord rent increases annually. Requires landlords to pay tenants when terminating or refusing to renew a rental agreement.
Title
Relating To Tenant Rights.
Sponsors
Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] | Rep. Linda Clark [D] | Rep. Ernesto Ganaden [D] | Rep. Greggor Ilagan [D] |
Rep. Jeanne Kapela [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-02 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2022-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-02-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 2 |
2022-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3326 (Same As) 2022-02-04 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1895&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB1895_.HTM |