HI HB1924 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-31 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, Matsumoto, Say excused (3).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-31 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, Matsumoto, Say excused (3).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires government entities to seek reimbursement for search and rescue expenses for persons who require rescue after leaving a hiking trail to enter a prohibited area or hiking on a trail closed to the public. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Search And Rescue.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-29 - House - House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-31 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, Matsumoto, Say excused (3). |
2020-01-31 | House | Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 11-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2020-01-29 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2020-01-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 01-29-20 10:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2020-01-23 | House | Referred to WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2376 (Same As) 2020-02-11 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Subjects
Closed to the Public
Department of Land and Natural Resources
Hiking Trails
Penalty
Search and Rescue
Trespassing
Department of Land and Natural Resources
Hiking Trails
Penalty
Search and Rescue
Trespassing