HI HB1940 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-15 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, C. Lee, M. Lee, Tokioka excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-15 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, C. Lee, M. Lee, Tokioka excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds from the agriculture development and food security special fund to fund plant quarantine inspectors and support staff. Effective February 1, 2050. (HB1940 HD1)
Title
Department of Agriculture; Inspectors; Appropriation
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Awana [D] | Rep. Pono Chong [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] | Rep. Ken Ito [D] |
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-15 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, C. Lee, M. Lee, Tokioka excused (4). | |
2012-02-15 | (H) Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 435-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2012-02-08 | (H) The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Hashem, Awana, Brower, Choy, Evans, McKelvey, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Marumoto, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2012-02-03 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 02-08-12 9:00AM in House conference room 312. | |
2012-01-19 | (H) Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2012-01-18 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-17 | (H) Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
SB2644 (Same As) 2012-01-25 - (S) Referred to HWN/AGL, WLH.