HI HB1944 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Filipino-American Veterans of World War II burial assistance program. Establishes the Filipino-American veterans of World War II burial assistance program special fund. Makes an appropriation. (HB1944 HD1)
Title
Relating To Filipino Veterans Burial Assistance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2959) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-18 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 18). |
2018-02-21 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Yamane excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-02-21 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 779-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-16 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Todd, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Fukumoto, Nakamura, Yamashita, Tupola. |
2018-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-16-18 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-02-13 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 315-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-08 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) LoPresti, Fukumoto, Cachola, Choy, Ito, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Thursday, 02-08-18 10:00AM in House conference room 429. |
2018-01-31 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 02-01-18 10:00AM in conference room 429. |
2018-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Thursday, 02-01-18 10:00AM in House conference room 429. |
2018-01-22 | House | Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2018-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |