HI HB1999 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - Referred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - Referred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the standard for the offenses of operating a vehicle under the influence of an intoxicant and habitually operating a vehicle under the influence of an intoxicant from .08 grams of alcohol per 210 liters of breath or 100 milliliters or cubic centimeters of blood to any measurable amount of alcohol in the person's breath or blood. Allows law enforcement officers to arrest a person if there is probable cause to believe that the person was operating a vehicle with a measurable amount of alcohol in the person's breath or blood.
Title
Relating To Operating A Vehicle Under The Influence Of An Intoxicant.
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Stacelynn Eli [D] |
Rep. Cedric Gates [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Rep. Scot Matayoshi [D] |
Rep. Val Okimoto [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-23 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2510 (Same As) 2020-02-05 - The committee on TRS deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1999&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB1999_.HTM |