HI SB2510 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - The committee on TRS deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - The committee on TRS deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the standard for the offenses of operating a vehicle under the influence of an intoxicant and habitually operating a vehicle under the influence of an intoxicant from .08 grams of alcohol per 210 liters of breath or 100 milliliters or cubic centimeters of blood to any measurable amount of alcohol in the person's breath or blood. Allows law enforcement officers to arrest a person if there is probable cause to believe that the person was operating a vehicle with a measurable amount of alcohol in the person's breath or blood.
Title
Relating To Operating A Vehicle Under The Influence Of An Intoxicant.
Sponsors
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | Senate | The committee on TRS deferred the measure. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-20 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Re-Referred to TRS, JDC. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to PSM/TRS, JDC. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1999 (Same As) 2020-01-23 - Referred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 4
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2510&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB2510_.HTM |