HI HB2040 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Carroll excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Carroll excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a Comprehensive Maternal and Child Health Quality Improvement Program and Hawaii Maternal and Child Health Quality Improvement Collaborative within the Department of Health. Requires the Department of Health to develop and publish a strategic plan on maternal and child health quality improvement. Effective July 1, 2014. (HB2040 HD1)
Title
Infant Mortality; Maternal and Child Health; Program; Collaborative; Strategic Plan ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-11 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Carroll excused (2). |
2014-02-11 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 329-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-02-05 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Oshiro, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Woodson. |
2014-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-05-14 8:35AM in House conference room 329. |
2014-01-21 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2014-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2444 (Same As) 2014-01-21 - Referred to HTH, WAM.