HI HB2048 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-29 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-29 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes clarifying amendments to the laws on general rules governing insurance contracts with respect to excepted lines of insurance and the conditions under which attorney's fees and costs of suit may be awarded.
Title
Insurance Contracts; Clarifying Amendments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-29 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2014-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 01-29-14 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2014-01-27 | House | The committee on CPC recommends that the measure be deferred until 01-29-14. |
2014-01-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 01-27-14 2:10PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-01-21 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 3 |
2014-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2048&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB2048_.HTM |