HI HB2049 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Act 109, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1209).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Act 109, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1209).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends or repeals various provisions of the Hawaii Revised Statutes or the Session Laws of Hawaii for the purposes of correcting errors and references, clarifying language, or deleting obsolete or unnecessary provisions. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Statutory Revision: Amending Or Repealing Various Provisions Of The Hawaii Revised Statutes Or The Session Laws Of Hawaii For The Purposes Of Correcting Errors And References, Clarifying Language, Or Deleting Obsolete Or Unnecessary Provisions.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-17 | House | Act 109, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1209). |
2022-06-17 | Senate | Act 109, 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1209). |
2022-05-04 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 822). |
2022-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2022-05-03 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2022-04-29 | House | Deferred one day 05-03-22. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 810). |
2022-04-28 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 03-29-22. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 807). |
2022-04-28 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2022-04-22 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 893). |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Rhoads Chair; Gabbard, Fevella. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 718). |
2022-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Matayoshi Chair; Belatti, Ward. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 360). |
2022-03-29 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2022-03-28 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 553) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-28-22. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3348) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2022-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 176). |
2022-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, McDermott, Nakashima excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-03 | House | Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, McDermott, Todd excused (3). |
2022-03-03 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 797-22), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2022-02-08 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, LoPresti. |
2022-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-08-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3309 (Same As) 2022-03-10 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 24