HI HB2050 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Referred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Referred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the counties to accept the surrender of a private road in cases where there has been an absence of any act of private ownership over the road for five years. Exempts the State and counties from performing any maintenance on a surrendered road and from liability arising from use of the road until the State or county performs maintenance work on the road. Deems a highway, road, alley, street, way, lane, bikeway, bridge, or trail that has been commonly used by residents of a particular area for emergency access purposes or for health and safety reasons to be publicly accessible for those reasons, without regard to actual ownership or responsibility for maintenance.
Title
Private Roads; Repair and Maintenance
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2372 (Same As) 2016-04-29 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-16 11:00AM in conference room 225.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2050&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB2050_.HTM |