HI HB2070 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-28 - Referred to HET, JHA , referral sheet 3
Pending: House Higher Education & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-28 - Referred to HET, JHA , referral sheet 3
Pending: House Higher Education & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends section 487N-5(a), Hawaii Revised Statutes, to allow for each member of the Information Privacy and Security Council to designate a designee to act on the member's behalf in order to ensure quorum.
Title
Relating To Information Privacy And Security Council.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to HET, JHA , referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3038 (Same As) 2022-04-27 - Act 011, 04/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1111).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2070&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB2070_.HTM |