HI SB3038 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-27 - Act 011, 04/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1111).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-27 - Act 011, 04/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1111).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends section 487N-5(a), Hawaii Revised Statutes, to allow for each member of the Information Privacy and Security Council to designate a designee to act on the member's behalf in order to ensure quorum.
Title
Relating To Information Privacy And Security Council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - House Higher Education & Technology: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - House Higher Education & Technology: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | Senate | Act 011, 04/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1111). |
2022-04-27 | House | Act 011, on 04/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1111). |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 524). |
2022-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kapela, McKelvey, Quinlan excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-08 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1893-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-03-29 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2022-03-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-29-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2022-03-22 | House | Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1174-22), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2022-03-16 | House | The committees on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Clark, Belatti, Costales, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Kapela, Ohno, Quinlan, Woodson, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2022-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HET on Wednesday, 03-16-22 2:00PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to HET, JHA, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-04 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 59). |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2776) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, DeCoite, Nishihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Fevella. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-23-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to CPN. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2533) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to CPN. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Chang, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-22 3:10PM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Referred to GVO, CPN. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2070 (Same As) 2022-01-28 - Referred to HET, JHA , referral sheet 3