HI HB2073 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-11 - Referred to JDC, WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-11 - Referred to JDC, WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes appropriations and approves payments for claims against the State, its officers, and its employees. (HD1)
Title
Making Appropriations For Claims Against The State, Its Officers, Or Its Employees.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 309). |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, McKelvey voting no (2) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1016-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-02-24 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2022-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-24-22 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har voting no (1) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). |
2022-02-15 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 380-22), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-02-03 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) McKelvey; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti, Lowen, Ward. |
2022-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-03-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3041 (Same As) 2022-05-06 - Enrolled to Governor.