HI HB2097 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-08 - (S) Referred to HTH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-08 - (S) Referred to HTH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the lapse date of the special purpose revenue bonds authorized to assist The Queen's Health Systems by Act 176, Session Laws of Hawaii 2003, as amended by Act 86, Session Laws of Hawaii 2007, from June 30, 2013, to June 30, 2017. Effective July 1, 2012. (HB2097 HD2)
Title
The Queen's Health Systems; SPRBs
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | (S) Referred to HTH, WAM. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 124). | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 796-12) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-02-23 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-02-21 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2012-02-21 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-23-12 12:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-02-10 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and C. Lee, M. Lee excused (2). | |
2012-02-10 | (H) Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 265-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2012-02-03 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Morikawa, Hanohano, Jordan, C. Lee, Mizuno, Wooley, Ching, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. | |
2012-01-31 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-03-12 9:00AM in House conference room 329. | |
2012-01-20 | (H) Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 4 | |
2012-01-20 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-19 | (H) Pending introduction. |