HI HB2097 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-04 - The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-04 - The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires twelve weeks of partially-paid leave at a maximum of sixty-six per cent of regular salary for all employees. Establishes trust fund funded by employee contributions. Appropriates funds to the Department of Labor and Industrial Relations for positions to administer the trust fund. Effective July 1, 2014.
Title
Family Leave; Partial Wage Replacement ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-04 | House | The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2014-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-04-14 9:15AM in conference room 309. |
2014-01-31 | House | The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-04-14. |
2014-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 01-31-14 9:00AM in conference room 309. |
2014-01-24 | House | The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 01-31-14. |
2014-01-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 01-24-14 8:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2014-01-21 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2014-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2523 (Same As) 2014-01-21 - Referred to JDL, WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2097&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB2097_.HTM |