HI HB2111 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Act 058, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1158).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Act 058, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1158).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the limited lines producer license to include all aspects of travel insurance. Removes references to outdated and obsolete limited lines product offerings. Excludes dental insurers and dental service corporations as third party administrators. Requires renewal certificates and audited financial statements in the annual reports of third party administrators. Beginning 1/1/2023, adopts the revised National Association of Insurance Commissioners' Suitability in Annuity Transactions Model Regulation. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Insurance.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-17 | House | Act 058, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1158). |
2022-06-17 | Senate | Act 058, 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1158). |
2022-05-04 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 824). |
2022-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 946). |
2022-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-22. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 7-22). |
2022-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-22. |
2022-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 7-22) as amended in (CD 1). |
2022-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-25 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-26-22 1:45PM in conference room 224. |
2022-04-22 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 893). |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Chang, Riviere, Fevella. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 718). |
2022-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Johanson Chair; Kitagawa, Matsumoto. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 383). |
2022-04-01 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2022-03-31 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 573) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-31-22. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3516) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2022-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, DeCoite, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to CPN. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 317). |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-03 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, McDermott, Todd excused (3). |
2022-03-03 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 773-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2022-02-24 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-24-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to CPC, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3079 (Same As) 2022-03-10 - Referred to CPC, referral sheet 24
Subjects
Annuity Transactions
Insurance Code
Limited Lines Producer Licenses
Producers
Surety Bonds
Third Party Administrators
Insurance Code
Limited Lines Producer Licenses
Producers
Surety Bonds
Third Party Administrators