HI HB2120 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-09 - (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, C. Lee, M. Lee, Souki excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-09 - (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, C. Lee, M. Lee, Souki excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes specific tax rates for the sale of pipe tobacco.
Title
Taxation; Pipe Tobacco
Sponsors
Rep. Pono Chong [D] | Rep. Marilyn Lee [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-09 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, C. Lee, M. Lee, Souki excused (4). | |
2012-02-09 | (H) Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 221-12), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2012-02-03 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Morikawa, Hanohano, Jordan, C. Lee, Mizuno, Wooley, Ching, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. | |
2012-01-31 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-03-12 9:00AM in House conference room 329. | |
2012-01-20 | (H) Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 4 | |
2012-01-20 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-19 | (H) Pending introduction. |