HI HB2147 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-07 - (H) The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-07 - (H) The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the penalties for: (1) unauthorized computer access in the first degree from a class B felony to a class A felony and increases the required value of information obtained from more than $5,000 to more than $20,000; (2) unauthorized computer access in the second degree from a class C felony to a class B felony; and (3) unauthorized computer access in the third degree from a misdemeanor to a class C felony.
Title
Unauthorized Computer Access; Penalties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-07 | (H) The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | |
2012-02-03 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-07-12 2:30PM in conference room 325. | |
2012-02-03 | (H) The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-07-12 at 2:30pm. | |
2012-02-01 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-03-12 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-01-20 | (H) Referred to JUD, referral sheet 5 | |
2012-01-20 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-19 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2147 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB2147_.HTM |