HI HB2147 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Act 009, 04/21/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1109).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Act 009, 04/21/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1109).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Reinstates the Department of Health's authority to permit federal municipal solid waste landfills. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Municipal Solid Waste Landfill Permits.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | Senate | Act 009, 04/21/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1109). |
2022-04-21 | House | Act 009, on 04/21/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1109). |
2022-04-08 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2022-04-08 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 724). |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Acasio, Ihara, Inouye). Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-08-22. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3845) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 04-04-22 1:15PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Re-Referred to AEN. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Referred to AEN/HTH/PSM, JDC. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 72). |
2022-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Todd excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-03 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 696-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-02-25 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kong, Tarnas. |
2022-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Friday, 02-25-22 1:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-18 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Kapela excused (2). |
2022-02-18 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 584-22), recommending referral to CPC. |
2022-02-17 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2022-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 02-17-22 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2022-02-08 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 84-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WAL. |
2022-02-03 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Perruso, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Matayoshi. |
2022-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-03-22 9:05AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to EEP, WAL, CPC, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3115 (Same As) 2022-01-26 - Referred to AEN/HTH/PSM, JDC.