HI HB2165 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-31 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-31 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a landlord from renting or leasing, or offering to rent or lease, a dwelling unit in the district described in section 4-1(2)(D), HRS, at a rate that exceeds the rate for which that dwelling unit was rented or leased or offered for rent or lease on 8/7/2023. Sunsets on 7/1/2025.
Title
Relating To Rent Control.
Sponsors
Rep. Elle Cochran [D] | Rep. Terez Amato [D] | Rep. Jeanne Kapela [D] | Rep. Rose Martinez [D] |
Rep. Amy Perruso [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-31 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2024-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 01-31-24 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 2 |
2024-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2862 (Same As) 2024-01-24 - Referred to CPN, JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2165&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB2165_.HTM |