HI SB2862 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to CPN, JDC.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to CPN, JDC.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a landlord from renting or leasing, or offering to rent or lease, a dwelling unit in the district described in section 41(2)(D), HRS, at a rate that exceeds the rate for which that dwelling unit was rented or leased or offered for rent or lease on 8/7/2023. Sunsets on 7/1/2025.
Title
Relating To Rent Control.
Sponsors
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] |
Sen. Tim Richards [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPN, JDC. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2165 (Same As) 2024-01-31 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2862&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB2862_.HTM |