HI HB2200 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-18 - The committee on HWN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-18 - The committee on HWN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the BLNR Chairperson to transfer public land trust funds to the Kahoolawe Rehabilitation Trust Fund. Authorizes the Office of Hawaiian Affairs to expend public land trust funds for purposes consistent with those of the Kahoolawe Rehabilitation Trust Fund. (HB2200 HD2)
Title
Kahoolawe Rehabilitation Trust Fund; Public Land Trust; OHA
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-18 | Senate | The committee on HWN deferred the measure. |
2016-03-18 | Senate | The committee on WLA deferred the measure. |
2016-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN/WLA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-16 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to HWN/WLA, WAM. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 267). |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) DeCoite, Oshiro, Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Jordan, Ward voting no (2) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1003-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-02-26 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, Johanson, LoPresti, Tokioka, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) DeCoite, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Onishi, Pouha, Ward; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen. |
2016-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-26-16 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2016-02-17 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) DeCoite, Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2016-02-17 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 368-16), recommending referral to FIN. |
2016-02-12 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Evans, Ing, C. Lee, Lowen, Nishimoto, Say, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 02-12-16 9:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2016-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tupola excused (1). |
2016-02-09 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 118-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WAL. |
2016-02-03 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Say, Yamane, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-02-02 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 02-03-16 10:15AM in House conference room 325. |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to OMH, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |