HI HB2207 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-16 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 785).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-16 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 785).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes minimum requirements for all dental assistants hired on or after 7/1/2018. Requires dental assistants employed on or after 7/1/2018 to successfully complete the Dental Assisting National Board, Inc.'s (DANB) National Entry Level Dental Assistant certification within three years of first being hired. Requires dental assistants with four or more years' experience to apply or register for the DANB's Certified Dental Assistant certification. Exempts dental assistants with more than ten years' experience from having to obtain a Certified Dental Assistant certification, but requires these dental assistants to hold a cardiopulmonary resuscitation certification and pass the DANB's Infection Control examination within two years. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Dental Assistants.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 785). |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; S. Chang, Ihara. |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Ohno, Takumi, Keohokalole Co-Chairs; Ito, Ward. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 546). |
2018-04-10 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-06 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 566) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-06-18. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3420) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Ihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Espero, Nishihara. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-18 9:15AM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 319). |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Woodson excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1097-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-03-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Keohokalole. |
2018-03-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-01-18 2:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-16 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 543-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-02-13 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, LoPresti, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Yamane, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Johanson. |
2018-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-13-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2018-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola excused (2). |
2018-02-08 | House | Reported from IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 166-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2018-02-06 | House | The committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Choy, Cachola, Fukumoto, Ito, LoPresti, Onishi, Tokioka, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by IAC on Tuesday, 02-06-18 10:30AM in House conference room 429. |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 8 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |