HI HB2228 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - The committee(s) on CMV/LGO recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Corrections, Military, & Veterans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - The committee(s) on CMV/LGO recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Corrections, Military, & Veterans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation to establish a pilot program to allow inmates to perform work for the State. Sunsets on 6/30/2026.
Title
Relating To The Department Of Corrections And Rehabilitation.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Hashem [D] | Rep. Cory Chun [D] | Rep. Jeanne Kapela [D] | Rep. Rose Martinez [D] |
Rep. Scot Matayoshi [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Jackson Sayama [D] | Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] |
Rep. Adrian Tam [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-14 | House | The committee(s) on CMV/LGO recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2024-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CMV/LGO on Wednesday, 02-14-24 9:00AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to CMV/LGO, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2228&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB2228_.HTM |