HI HB2284 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-08 - The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-08 - The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals language that gives the Director of Finance discretion to use moneys in the Hawaii ABLE Savings Program Trust Fund if the Director elects to accept deposits from contributors instead of sending deposits directly to the ABLE program manager. Authorizes the Director of Finance to expend moneys in the Hawaii ABLE Savings Program Trust Fund to provide incentive payments to Hawaii public school ABLE account owners. Declares that the general fund expenditure ceiling is exceeded. Makes an appropriation to the Department of Budget and Finance to fund the incentive payments. Makes an appropriation to the Department of Health for one full-time equivalent (1.0 FTE) permanent position within the State Council on Developmental Disabilities to provide statewide outreach, advocacy, and relationship management for the Hawaii ABLE savings program.
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Able Savings Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2024-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 02-08-24 9:45AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3003 (Same As) 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2284&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB2284_.HTM |