HI HB2290 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-26 - Referred to CPC, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-26 - Referred to CPC, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits planned community associations from planting yellow oleander or causing or allowing yellow oleander to be planted on their real property. Effective 7/1/2025.
Title
Relating To Landscaping.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to CPC, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2290&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB2290_.HTM |