HI HB2322 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-09 - (H) The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-09 - (H) The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the ten per cent ethanol by volume requirement for gasoline sold in Hawaii for use in motor vehicles. Requires the Hawaii state energy office to submit reports on local ethanol production.
Title
Fuel; Gasoline; Ethanol
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-09 | (H) The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | |
2012-02-06 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-09-12 8:30AM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-02-02 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on EEP with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Okamura excused (1). | |
2012-02-02 | (H) Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 57-12), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EEP. | |
2012-01-30 | (H) The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Souki, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cullen, M. Lee, Luke, Okamura, Saiki, Takumi, Yamashita, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2012-01-26 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Monday, 01-30-12 9:00AM in House conference room 309. | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Referred to TRN, EEP, FIN, referral sheet 7 | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-23 | (H) Pending introduction. |