HI HB2341 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-04 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-04 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends or repeals various provisions of the Hawaii Revised Statutes and the Session Laws of Hawaii for the purpose of correcting errors and references, clarifying language, and deleting obsolete or unnecessary provisions.
Title
Revision Bill
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-04 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2010-02-02 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-04-10 2:20pm in House conference room 325. | |
2010-01-22 | (H) Referred to JUD, referral sheet 4 | |
2010-01-22 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2341&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HB2341_.HTM |