HI HB2341 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Reduces the threshold amount for electronic fund transfers of taxes.
Title
Taxation; Electronic Filing and Payment of Taxes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 339). |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Hanohano, Jordan, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Wooley excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-03-04 | House | Floor amendment failed following a Voice Vote: Noes, 1 (Representative(s) Luke). Excused, 2 (Representative(s) Carroll, Wooley). |
2014-03-04 | House | Floor Amendment No. 4 offered by Rep. Ward. |
2014-02-28 | House | Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Luke, Nakashima, Thielen, Woodson excused (5). |
2014-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 679-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2014-02-12 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2014-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-12-14 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2891 (Same As) 2014-02-05 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.