HI HB2377 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-24 - Act 026, 05/23/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1126).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-24 - Act 026, 05/23/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1126).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adjust funding for Department of Public Safety programs for anticipated operating shortfalls due to the limited ability for departments to transfer funds between programs. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Funding Adjustments For State Programs.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-24 | Senate | Act 026, 05/23/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1126). |
2024-05-24 | House | Act 026, on 05/23/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1126). |
2024-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830). |
2024-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 798). |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2024-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ganaden, Martinez, Nakashima excused (3). |
2024-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24 |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 143-24). |
2024-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday 05-01-24. |
2024-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 143-24) as amended in (CD 1). |
2024-04-26 | House | Received from Governor re: Immediate Passage (Gov. Msg. No. 9). |
2024-04-24 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Kitagawa, Yamashita, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-04-22 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-24-24 9:35AM in conference room 309. |
2024-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 697). |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Moriwaki Chair; Wakai, Fevella. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 760). |
2024-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Kitagawa Chair; Nishimoto, Yamashita, Alcos. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731). |
2024-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2024-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 595) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Ihara). Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-24. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3643) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kanuha. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-01-24 10:50AM; CR 211. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-24 9:50AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 362). |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Martinez, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ichiyama, Matayoshi, Quinlan, Woodson excused (5). |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 745-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2024-02-21 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran, Ward. |
2024-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-21-24 2:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3066 (Same As) 2024-01-26 - Referred to WAM.