HI HB2382 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-19 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-19 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that an internet web address be included on a meeting notice for instructions on submitting testimony for a meeting; allows boards and commissions to provide notice of a meeting by first class mail or electronic means, including electronic mail and text messaging; requires boards and commissions to provide instructions and contact information for persons to request to be included on the list for notification of meetings to be sent via postal mail or electronic means; and specifies that any person who fails to properly send meeting notices by postal mail or electronic means or fails to send meeting notices in a timely manner shall be subject to penalties.
Title
Sunshine Law; Notice
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-19 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2014-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-19-14 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2014-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-19-14. |
2014-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-12-14 2:10PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to CPC, referral sheet 7 |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2289 (Same As) 2014-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2382&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB2382_.HTM |