HI HB2382 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-14 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-14 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Transfers the statutory provisions of section 188-58.5, Hawaii Revised Statutes, that prohibit the taking or killing of female spiny lobsters, kona crabs, and samoan crabs, to administrative rules of the Department of Land and Natural Resources.
Title
Relating To Crustaceans.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-02-14 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 369-18), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2018-02-09 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, DeCoite, Creagan, Gates, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say. |
2018-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Friday, 02-09-18 10:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to OMH, JUD, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2809 (Same As) 2018-01-24 - Referred to WTL, JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2382&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB2382_.HTM |