HI HB2382 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-02 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-02 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adjusts towing company charges and fees for vehicles left unattended or abandoned. Establishes a clean-up charge and documentation fee.
Title
Relating To Tow Truck Pricing.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-02 | House | The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2022-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-02-22 10:30AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2369 (Same As) 2022-02-01 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2382&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB2382_.HTM |