HI HB2401 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands authority of the Director of Transportation over required motor carrier vehicle inspections. (HB2401 HD1)
Title
Relating To Motor Vehicle Inspections.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-02-14 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 358-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-07 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Quinlan, Brower, Hashem, Nakamura, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2018-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-07-18 10:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2828 (Same As) 2018-03-21 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, C. Lee, McKelvey, Souki, Todd, Ward excused (6).