HI SB2828 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, C. Lee, McKelvey, Souki, Todd, Ward excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, C. Lee, McKelvey, Souki, Todd, Ward excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands authority of the Director of Transportation over required motor carrier vehicle safety inspections by authorizing the Director to adjust inspection fees and alter administration of the program through administrative rule-making. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Motor Vehicle Inspections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, C. Lee, McKelvey, Souki, Todd, Ward excused (6). |
2018-03-21 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1242-18), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-03-14 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Quinlan, Brower, Hashem, Nakamura, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2018-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 03-14-18 10:30AM in House conference room 423. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 327) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2791) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kidani, Shimabukuro. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-18 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Reported from TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2235) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Espero, English, Harimoto, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-18 1:45PM in conference room 225. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to TRE, WAM. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2401 (Same As) 2018-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).