HI HB2419 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Har excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Har excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Employment First as a policy of the State and counties for persons with disabilities. Requires state and county agencies to implement Employment First in hiring and in all programs and services administered or funded by the State or counties. Applies Employment First principles to Medicaid home- and community-based waiver programs. Takes effect on 12/31/2059. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Employment Of Persons With Disabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-07 - House - House Human Services & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Har excused (2). |
2020-02-13 | House | Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 390-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-02-07 | House | The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Say. |
2020-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSH on Friday, 02-07-20 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2020-01-31 | House | Re-referred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 11 |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to HSH/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2247 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Referred to HMS/LCA, CPH.