HI HB243 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds through the issuance of general obligation bonds for the repair and maintenance of irrigation systems. Renames the existing irrigation repair and maintenance special fund as the agricultural infrastructure improvement special fund and allows the special fund to also be used for agricultural water and land planning. Effective July 1, 2020. (HB243 HD2)
Title
Agriculture; Irrigation Systems; Appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Referred to WTL, WAM. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 70). | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takai excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2009-03-06 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-2009. | |
2009-03-06 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 902) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-04 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Pine, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2009-02-28 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-03-09 6:30pm in House conference room 308. | |
2009-02-18 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Bertram, Takai, Takumi excused (3). | |
2009-02-17 | (H) Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 347) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2009-02-11 | (H) The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Wooley, Choy, Evans, Manahan, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Berg, McKelvey, Wakai, Marumoto. | |
2009-02-06 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-11-09 9:00am in conference room 312. | |
2009-02-06 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2009-02-04 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-06-09 11:15AM in conference room 312. | |
2009-02-04 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 02-06-09. | |
2009-02-02 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 02-04-09 9:00am in House conference room 312. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2009-01-23 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-22 | (H) Pending introduction. |