HI HB243 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-26 - Referred to EDB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-26 - Referred to EDB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes out-of-state CPAs to practice in the State without a license under certain conditions.
Title
Public Accountancy; Out-of-State; Reciprocity
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to EDB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2015-01-23 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB543 (Same As) 2015-03-12 - Referred to EDB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 30
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=243&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HB243_.HTM |