HI HB243 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB243
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Education to contract with a consulting firm that specializes in school finance, particularly with respect to adequacy studies of public education systems in multiple states, to perform a study on the adequacy of funding for education in Hawaii. Appropriates funds. (HB243 HD1)
Title
Relating To Education Funding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-12 - House - House Lower and Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 501) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-12 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Perruso, DeCoite, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Quinlan, Tarnas, Tokioka, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Tuesday, 02-12-19 2:15PM in House conference room 309. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB243 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).